Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT SWITHUN, PURLEY
Charity number: 1130779
Charity reporting is overdue by 258 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Fiona Margaret Weaver | Chair | 23 June 2013 |
|
|||||
Patricia Elizabeth Hardie | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Game | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Charles Blair-Ford | Trustee | 10 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Admira Joko-John B Ed | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JENNY CAMERON BLAIR-FORD | Trustee | 20 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
John Yorke | Trustee | 19 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANNE ROURKE | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT BRIAN PAGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL SANDFORD | Trustee |
|
||||||
EVANGELINE ALLI | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.