Trustees CHEPSTOW METHODIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1130776
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
27 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev PAUL STANLEY ROBERT CHESWORTH | Chair | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Russell Charles Collins | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALLYSON GAIL BARNES | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY ANN DAVIES | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHERYL TRACEY HAY | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH LOUISE CAIRNS | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
TONY WILLIAMS | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOY WILSON | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL GILLIAN EVANS | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN EDWIN THOMAS WESTLAKE | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN KEVAN WILLIAM GILES | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
CYNTHIA MAY GILES | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
ENID KEE | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
BERYL ANN QUINLAN | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|||||
ALLAN KEITH STRANGE | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Collins | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN GRIFFIN | Trustee | 10 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
STUART NUTTALL | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|||||
RICHARD JAMES LIDDELL | Trustee | 15 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA ANN HORNE | Trustee | 15 June 2008 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE STEPHANIE DAVIES | Trustee | 15 June 2000 |
|
|
||||
MS KATHY GRIFFIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH MAURICE HARVEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARGARET BISHOP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET ANN HARVEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAIR LIDDELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELENA JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.