Trustees Barton, Brigg and Wolds Circuit
Charity number: 1132257
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
48 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Sally Jane Long | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
BRIAN WILLIAM COOK | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Brian James Field | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janice Mary Cook | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jean Bates | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Frances Woolf | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth George Knapton | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Dawson | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUE BRUMPTON | Trustee | 31 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Brian Kenneth Brooks CiLCA MIET | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Mary Greenfield | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Sheard BAHonsPGCE | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Jane Ellis PG Dip | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adam John Ellis BA MJur | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Marie Brooks-Sleight | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Lawtey | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gloria Elwick | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nigel Joshua Clements | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
George William Turner | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Richard Bailey MA CEng | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Brian Robert Gray | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anne Christina Morgan | Trustee | 18 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Barbara Joan Woodward | Trustee | 11 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Ann Harris | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Knapton | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jean Edith Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ROBERT MCCARTNEY BSC | Trustee | 02 September 2013 |
|
|||||
PAT FRANKISH | Trustee | 02 September 2013 |
|
|||||
RUTH TURNER | Trustee | 14 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARJORY TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Mary Joan Knaggs | Trustee |
|
||||||
HEATHER BUNKER BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WENDY ALICE FOWLER | Trustee |
|
||||||
RUTH ANNIE BLYTHE | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROSALIND ANN JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
PAM MCCARTNEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOYCE PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev ENID MARGARET KNOWLES BED, | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV DAVID JOHN EDWARD WOODWARD BSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE MARGARET RANYELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN NORWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL ANN DICKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATE MARR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUE BELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOREEN COULSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VALERIE ANN DIBDIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BILL SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARIE ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.