Trustees Methodist Conference Property at Central Hall Westminster
Charity number: 1133912
Charity reporting is overdue by 43 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Nigel Cowgill | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
BALA GNANAPRAGASAM | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
WESLEY GIBBS | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lansford Herbert Penn-Timity MA | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Michael Eccles CBE | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Martin Lougher BSc, BArch | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Ruby Beech | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Joanna Elisabeth Williamson MA BA | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
MIchael Swanson Davies BA Hons | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Genevieve Patnelli | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Anoom LLB, LLM | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nevil Edwin Tomlinson | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
NANA AMA ACKAH-YENSU | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
KOJO AMOAH-ARKO | Trustee | 19 September 2012 |
|
|||||
Rev ANTHONY DAVID MILES | Trustee | 12 March 2012 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.