Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BURLEY IN WHARFEDALE
Charity number: 1134154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ALASTAIR KIRK | Chair | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nerys Yeates | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Merrick | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANNETTE HATTERSLEY | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sally Weatherall | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Spencer | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARK SELBY | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Berry | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|||||
MARY MARGARET BROOKS | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|||||
SUSAN COLLINS | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE JAMES | Trustee | 28 October 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.