Trustees TRINITY METHODIST CHURCH, OADBY
Charity number: 1143707
Charity reporting is overdue by 409 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
27 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DEREK JOHN MCLEAN | Chair | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Heather Alison Corlett | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Israel Selvanayagam | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Charles Nigel Hilton | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Paula Hunt | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Christine Elizabeth McLean | Trustee | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Alison Margaret Wootton | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
PATRICIA LOCKLEY | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr DAVID MICHAEL ADAMS | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Penelope Elizabeth Lee | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
DR Alison Katharine Baker MB, ChB | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Howard Ernest Smith | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|||||||||
Barry William Wilford | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
HELEN MARGARET COOPER | Trustee | 30 December 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
Michael Elliott | Trustee | 30 December 2013 |
|
|||||||||
JONATHAN MARK WILFORD MA, PGCE | Trustee | 30 December 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
DAVID MALCOLM FROST C.M.A. | Trustee | 19 August 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
DIANE PRICE BA, PGCE | Trustee | 19 August 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
RICHARD IAN BELL | Trustee | 19 August 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
JANICE MARY WILFORD | Trustee | 19 August 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
SUZANNE KELLY | Trustee | 19 August 2011 |
|
|||||||||
BARBARA CHRISTINE BELL | Trustee | 19 August 2011 |
|
|||||||||
ANNE ELIZABETH DODGE MCSP, | Trustee | 19 August 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr DONALD BRIAN CANDLIN MA,MSC,PHD | Trustee | 19 August 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
GRAHAM NORMAN AUSTEN B.A., FCII | Trustee | 19 August 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
MARION CANDLIN | Trustee | 19 August 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
LESLEY RUTH GREEN BSC. | Trustee | 19 August 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.