Trustees THE ENGLISH ARTS CHORALE ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1153599
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geoffrey Whiffin | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Cheema | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Scott | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Alison Jane Martin | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Nasskau | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dianne Mitchell | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Joanna Arnold Dr | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL GREEN | Trustee | 12 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
LESLIE WILLIAM OLIVE | Trustee | 12 September 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.