Trustees HOPE FOR CHILDREN
Charity number: 1161729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEN MCMILLAN | Chair | 19 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Zeta Sear | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
DIPAKBA MANUBHA JETHWA | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tekeste Ghebray Tekie | Trustee | 31 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julian Morgan Skeens | Trustee | 21 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Phillips | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Adrian May | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emilie Giles | Trustee | 05 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Iain Smith | Trustee | 20 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Neylon | Trustee | 20 May 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.