Trustees THE CLWYD-POWYS ARCHAEOLOGICAL TRUST
Charity number: 508301
Charity reporting is up to date (82 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katherine Longley | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Richard Parry Davenport | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
FIONA GALE | Trustee | 20 October 2018 |
|
|||||
EVA BREDSDORFF | Trustee | 05 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr SIAN ELUNED REES | Trustee | 02 November 2011 |
|
|||||
DR JEFFREY LYN DAVIES BA FSA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.