Governance The Anabaptist Mennonite Network
Charity number: 1175973
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 28 November 2017: CIO registration
- 12 August 2020: Funds received from 1021760 ANABAPTIST NETWORK TRUST
- 15 February 2021: Funds received from 227410 THE LONDON MENNONITE TRUST
- 29 March 2022: Funds received from 1058376 WOOD GREEN MENNONITE CHURCH TRUST
- 17 April 2023: Funds received from 1142739 INCARNATE NETWORK
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
- THE MENNONITE TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.