Trustees PATCHWORK FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1177576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Farmida Bi CBE | Chair | 12 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Mustapha Ogun | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Shwetal Shah | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Makedah Simpson | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Poppy Mitchell-Rose | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sheikh Aliur Rahman | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Holt | Trustee | 21 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sir SIMON JAMES FRASER GCMG | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
HARRIS BOKHARI OBE | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|||||
MRS MELANIE DAWES | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
OLUWAFUNMILAYO SHOGELOLA | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.