Trustees DEVON MIND
Charity number: 1181767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon Ann Claridge | Chair | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Keane | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Cozic | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN CORDY | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Penny Blackmore | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Southcott | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Euan Hails MBE QN | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Stephen Douglas Offord | Trustee | 17 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Edward Evans | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Neil Anthony Pick | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Guildford | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.