Trustees BEETLEY AND DISTRICT PRE-SCHOOL
Charity number: 1181636
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Cross | Chair | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Reynolds | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Pulfer | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Lawrence | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Edwards | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Jenkins | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charlie Wood | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
William Wilson | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zoe May Smith | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diane Calvert | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.