Trustees WAVE FORWARD
Charity number: 1191038
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abigail Last | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ben Michael McGregor | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Cragg | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|||||
David Beuzeval | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Kyle Sandham | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Clifford-Perkins | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.