Trustees YORK MINSTER
Charity number: 1201499
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVD CANON JAMES HARLEY MILNE | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Britton | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Catherine Eve Poole | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|||||
REVD CANON TIMOTHY GOODE | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
PETER NEVILLE COLLIER KC | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
THE VERY REVD DOMINIC MATTHEW JESSE BARRINGTON | Trustee | 12 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Tembey | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Dunsmore | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Revd Canon Margaret McLean | Trustee | 17 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sir William Worsley | Trustee | 15 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.