Governing document NEW LIFE COMMUNITY CHURCH
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 OCTOBER 1987 AS AMENDED 19 OCTOBER 1988 , 27 OCTOBER 1992, 23 JANUARY 1993, 26 OCTOBER 1993, 27 OCTOBER 1998 AND 29 OCTOBER 2002
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY PROCLAIMING THE DOCTRIME BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF CHRISTIANITY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEF SET OUT IN FIRST SCHEDULE OF THE CONSTITUTION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE AIREBOROUGH AND OTLEY AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.