Trustees PETERBOROUGH DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION
Charity number: 1204953
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Venerable Richard Ormston | Chair | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Amanda de Choisy | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Lynda Mary Johnson | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Douglas Spenceley | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Christine Eccles | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Ronald Eric Whittaker | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Fiona Katherine Yardley | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Lamb | Trustee | 25 May 2024 |
|
|||||||
Rev James Benedict John Saunders | Trustee | 25 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Wayne Jones | Trustee | 25 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Katrina Hutchins | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|||||||
Greg Cracknell | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.