Trustees ALVECHURCH VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 523090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher James Davies | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Tony Wallis | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Burch | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mike Crook | Trustee | 07 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Miall | Trustee | 07 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Yendell | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Evans | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEVE SIDDLE | Trustee | 19 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Annette English | Trustee | 06 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Janet Brice | Trustee | 02 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Riley | Trustee | 20 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL WATKISS | Trustee | 18 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
CLARE HOWE | Trustee | 05 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
NORMA DIVINE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.