Trustees THE BRYN ILLTYD YOUTH TRUST
Charity number: 524184
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Patricia Powell | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Dawn Howles | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Graham Morgan | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alyson Jones | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
|||||
DR PETER DAVID ELLIS | Trustee | 08 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROY RICHARDS | Trustee | 04 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY JOHN DOLLOWAY WELLSBURY | Trustee | 04 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
AUDREY HANNAH JAMES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.