NUFFIELD HEALTH

Charity number: 205533
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14/1/1957 AMENDED 22/10/1959,22/5/1960,19/9/1967,30/3/1987,19/5/1993,27/9/2000,30/4/2001, 23/3/2005,26/4/2006, 22/4/2008,24/6/2009 AND 23/6/2010 REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 9/7/2010 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 JUN 2017

Charitable objects

TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE AND MAINTAIN HEALTH AND HEALTH CARE OF ALL DESCRIPTIONS AND TO PREVENT, RELIEVE AND CURE SICKNESS AND ILL HEALTH OF ANY KIND

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

NOT DEFINED