NUFFIELD HEALTH

Charity number: 205533
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £136.10m £0 £109.48m N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £631.50m £839.60m £800.02m £946.20m £993.30m
Total expenditure £771.50m £837.00m £933.30m £953.70m £1.01bn