LIFEARC

Charity number: 1015243
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Zahn Trustee 15 August 2019 None on record
DR MIKE ROMANOS Trustee 01 March 2016 None on record
Peter Keen Trustee 09 December 2013 None on record
Aisling Burnand Trustee 20 November 2017 None on record
Andrew Paul Mercieca Trustee 14 November 2019 None on record
Daniel Morgan Trustee 20 November 2017 None on record
Lynne Robb Trustee 08 June 2020 None on record
DR Sally Sutherland Burtles Trustee 09 December 2013 None on record
Dr JOHN STAGEMAN Chair 29 September 2014 None on record
Dr Melanie Georgina Lee Trustee 14 November 2019
UK DRI LTD Charity reporting is up to date
DR PAUL MUSSENDEN Trustee 19 June 2014 None on record
DR LESLIE HUGHES Trustee 01 March 2016 None on record