Governing document THE DEXTER CATTLE SOCIETY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/10/1899 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/03/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/10/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/10/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/10/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/10/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/10/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 JAN 2017 as amended on 02 Jun 2018 as amended on 12 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE BY REGISTERING, MONITORING AND EXHIBITING DEXTER CATTLE AND INVESTIGATING AND ENCOURAGING EFFICIENT BREEDING OF DEXTER CATTLE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING AND INCREASING THE NUMBERS OF THE BREED
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.