THE DEXTER CATTLE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1000520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £132.89k £126.68k £117.75k £117.75k £112.45k
Total expenditure £161.52k £147.69k £149.30k £149.30k £100.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A