Trustees THE ABBEYFIELD HOYLAKE AND WEST KIRBY SOCIETY LTD
Charity number: 233269
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Burgess | Trustee | 30 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Jane Pike | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Yarwood | Trustee | 11 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Hitchcox | Trustee | 21 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Leech | Trustee | 04 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Farmer | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.