Trustees THE ABBEYFIELD HOYLAKE AND WEST KIRBY SOCIETY LTD

Charity number: 233269
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Yarwood Trustee 11 August 2020
None on record
Lisa Hitchcox Trustee 21 August 2019
None on record
Susan Leech Trustee 04 December 2018
None on record
Nicholas John Farmer Trustee 01 November 2018
None on record
Christopher Stringer Trustee 23 May 2017
None on record
Jane Hyndman Trustee 01 July 2014
None on record