Trustees SOUTH OXFORD COMMUNITY-ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 304351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CATHERINE MOREY | Chair | 30 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Anna Railton | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Anne Muir | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ben Sorgiovanni | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Stentiford | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bodo Schulenburg | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Watts | Trustee | 21 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Martin Paul Beek | Trustee | 21 March 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.