SOUTH OXFORD COMMUNITY-ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 304351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £58.80k £56.59k £66.22k £67.36k £47.32k
Total expenditure £50.75k £51.40k £62.22k £74.65k £47.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £11.33k