Governance THE MISSION TO SEAFARERS
Charity number: 1123613
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 12 April 2008: Standard registration
- 15 November 2013: Funds received from 212432 THE MISSION TO SEAFARERS
- 25 April 2019: Funds received from 1039266 MILFORD HAVEN INTERNATIONAL SEAFARERS' CENTRE
- 16 October 2020: Funds received from 1167934 THE PLYMOUTH MERCHANT NAVY MONUMENT
- 12 March 2024: Funds received from 1081761 ADRIAN JOHN HOWARD-BLOOD CHARITABLE TRUST
- 12 March 2024: Funds received from 1081761 ADRIAN JOHN HOWARD-BLOOD CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
- THE MISSION TO SEAFARERS LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.