THE MISSION TO SEAFARERS

Charity number: 1123613
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.46m £3.96m £4.91m £4.33m £5.80m
Total expenditure £5.20m £5.03m £5.07m £5.33m £5.22m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £102.81k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.11m £2.47m £2.68m £2.75m £4.48m
Income - Other trading activities £168.00k £168.00k £148.00k £197.00k £192.00k
Income - Charitable activities £364.00k £394.00k £458.00k £412.00k £270.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £541.00k £851.00k £850.00k £831.00k £708.00k
Income - Other £280.00k £83.00k £773.00k £139.00k £157.00k
Income - Legacies £1.21m £695.00k £918.00k £758.00k £1.20m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.21m £4.21m £4.21m £4.35m £4.38m
Expenditure - Raising funds £989.00k £818.00k £863.00k £979.00k £841.00k
Expenditure - Governance £37.00k £36.00k £48.00k £122.00k £105.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £808.00k £877.00k £842.00k £992.00k £1.07m
Expenditure - Investment management £65.00k £31.00k £29.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0