Trustees 1ST WARGRAVE SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1061190
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LESLEY HUCKER | Chair | 01 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
John Wheals | Trustee | 13 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elizabeth Abbott | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kieron Mark Gwyn Edwards | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard Charles Best | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
PETER CONNOR FRY | Trustee | 01 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
BILL BOOKLESS | Trustee | 01 September 1993 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL BOARD | Trustee | 01 September 1990 |
|
|
||||
JANET MARY MOSELEY | Trustee | 01 June 1986 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.