Financial history 1ST WARGRAVE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1061190
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £17.54k £18.27k £14.03k £15.11k £7.93k
Total expenditure £19.97k £16.73k £12.53k £19.94k £2.96k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A