Trustees THE HOUNSLOW ARTS TRUST LTD
Charity number: 267426
Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clare Hayes Guymer | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zulandi van der Westhuizen | Trustee | 31 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Zaid Haroon | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Philip Rhys Williams | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Little | Trustee | 23 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Renata Mludzinska | Trustee | 23 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Manjit Hunjan | Trustee | 29 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr William David Evans | Trustee | 24 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
DUNCAN SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.