Trustees THE MAYOR OF SOUTHWARK'S COMMON GOOD TRUST
Charity number: 280011
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Duckett | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
BARRY DUCKETT | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sunil Chopra | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nick George | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Alan John Coyle MP | Trustee | 19 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JOHN STEWART SKELLY | Trustee | 19 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Charlie Smith Councillor | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH MERVYN HAYES | Trustee | 04 March 2013 |
|
|||||
Lord ROY FRANCIS KENNEDY | Trustee | 04 March 2013 |
|
|||||
VICKY NAISH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DUSSELL CHARLAMBOUS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.