Governing document HEATHFIELD SCHOOL
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 26/10/1955 AS AMENDED 20/12/1955, 16/10/1956, 21/10/1958, 28/11/1961, 22/2/1962, 13/11/2002, 8/6/2005, 13/12/2006, 28/11/2007, 25/04/2008 AND 6 MARCH 2009.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING BY: 1) THE PROVISION AND CONDUCT, IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ABROAD, OF A SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS FOR BOYS AND/OR GIRLS UNDER THE NAME HEATHFIELD SCHOOL TO BE CONDUCTED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TRADITIONS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND INCLUDING THE ANGLO-CATHOLIC TRADITION ("THE SCHOOL"); AND 2) INSOFAR AS IT IS INCIDENTAL OR ANCILLARY TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, SUCH OTHER MEANS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.