HEATHFIELD SCHOOL

Charity number: 309086
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Karen Julie Hurt Trustee 26 March 2021 None on record
Tom Cross Brown Chair 22 June 2016
THE ST MARY'S SCHOOL WANTAGE BURSARY FUND Received: On time
ROBERT BENEDICT GREGORY Trustee None on record
PETER WILLIAM GUY EGERTON-SMITH Trustee None on record
REVD. CANON PHILIP URSELL Trustee None on record
Suzanne Clare Cullen Trustee 12 November 2021 None on record
RIGHT REVEREND JONATHAN MARK RICHARD BAKER Trustee
THE SOCIETY OF ST STEPHEN'S HOUSE Received: 13 days late
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND Received: On time
PARISH ESTATES CHARITY Received: On time
BROMFIELD'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
FORWARD IN FAITH Received: On time
ASCOT PRIORY Received: On time
THE MASONS COMPANY CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
ST ANDREW HOLBORN AND STAFFORD'S CHARITY Received: On time
ST ANDREW HOLBORN CHURCH FOUNDATION Received: On time
STAFFORD'S CHARITY Received: On time
LADY ELIZABETH HATTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
Andrew Steven Melcher Trustee 26 March 2020 None on record
SALLY VIRGINIA TULK HART Trustee None on record
Anne Jeanette Lynch Trustee 12 November 2021 None on record
Hon Frances Caroline Stanley Trustee 13 January 2017
THE NATIONAL HORSERACING MUSEUM Received: 3 days late
Charlotte Faber Trustee 20 February 2018 None on record