Trustees CHRISTIAN SURFERS UNITED KINGDOM
Charity number: 1070830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT CHARLES CROUCH | Chair | 09 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Benjamin Lillie | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Quinn | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Ellse | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Rundle | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chelsea Jade Elizabeth Holter | Trustee | 09 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALICE ELIZABETH LOUISE OVENDEN | Trustee | 10 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW SWIFT | Trustee | 07 February 2014 |
|
|||||
Philip Williams | Trustee | 28 March 1998 |
|
|
||||
REV DAVE MATTHEWS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR MIKE SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.