CHRISTIAN SURFERS UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 1070830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £62.90k £52.17k £57.22k £62.54k £41.27k
Total expenditure £55.00k £57.01k £50.49k £51.95k £34.62k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A