Trustees OFF THE RECORD (BRISTOL)
Charity number: 1085351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacob Diggle | Chair | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Henry Coghlan | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joe Raynes | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mx Aysha Marie Santiben Tailor - Whyte | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amaleehah Marie Ann Aslam Forrester | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jordan Hodge | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Leech | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tom Le Fanu | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bryony Montandon | Trustee | 15 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr RACHEL BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.