Trustees TRELYA
Charity number: 1089634
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR ROD JAMES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sara Davey | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cornelius Olivier | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Gallagher | Trustee | 07 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Tracy Whelan BEM | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Bride Heron MBE | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Helen Mcknight | Trustee | 14 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jean Favata | Trustee | 14 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carol Bosworth | Trustee | 23 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL CLIFFORD WALKER | Trustee |
|
||||||
JILL TRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTONY PENHAUL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.