Trustees TRELYA

Charity number: 1089634
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR ROD JAMES Chair
None on record
Cornelius Olivier Trustee 15 March 2022
PENGARTH DAY CENTRE
Recently registered
Gillian Gallagher Trustee 07 January 2020
None on record
Carolyn Tracy Whelan BEM Trustee 16 November 2019
None on record
Katharine Bride Heron MBE Trustee 06 November 2019
None on record
Emma Jean Favata Trustee 14 March 2017
None on record
Philippa Helen Mcknight Trustee 14 March 2017
None on record
Caroline White Trustee 23 October 2014
None on record
Carol Bosworth Trustee 23 October 2014
None on record
NIGEL CLIFFORD WALKER Trustee
Music For Good
Received: On time
ANTONY PENHAUL Trustee
None on record
JILL TRY Trustee
None on record