Governing document ADARA DEVELOPMENT (UK)
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 MAY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 3 JUNE 2003, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 21 JUNE 2010, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 18 FEBRUARY 2011 AND AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 10 NOVEMBER 2014.
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD; 2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD; 3) FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY THE PROVISION OF HEALTHCARE ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD. IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS THE TRUSTEES MAY, IN PARTICULAR, ALONE OR IN ASSOCIATION WITH OTHERS, (BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE OBJECTS LISTED ABOVE): A) INITIATE HEALTHCARE PROJECTS IN THE DEVELOPING WORLD WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING THE HEALTH OF CHILDREN OR ADULTS IN UNDERPRIVILEGED COMMUNITIES; B) PROMOTE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE AID IN THE FIELDS OF NUTRITION, MATERNAL CARE, IMMUNISATION AND CLEAN WATER; C) PROCURE ESSENTIAL DRUGS AND MEDICAL EQUIPMENT FOR USE IN UNDERPRIVILEGED COMMUNITIES; D) PROCURE ESSENTIAL DRUGS AND MEDICAL EQUIPMENT FOR USE IN UNDERPRIVILEGED COMMUNITIES; E) EDUCATE AND TRAIN HEALTHCARE WORKERS TO PROVIDE HEALTHCARE SERVICES; F) FUND CHILDREN'S HOMES AND SCHOOLS. G) ESTABLISH, SUPPORT OR TRANSFER FUNDS TO ANY CHARITABLE TRUST, CHARITABLE COMPANY OR OTHER ASSOCIATION OR INSTITUTION WHICH IS FORMED FOR ANY OF THE OBJECTS IN 1 TO 3 ABOVE
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.