ADARA DEVELOPMENT (UK)

Charity number: 1098152
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £291.45k £348.96k £377.22k £299.91k £341.54k
Total expenditure £277.89k £390.46k £322.34k £294.07k £418.96k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A