ADARA DEVELOPMENT (UK)

Charity number: 1098152
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 11 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 19 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 14 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 08 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 02 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 02 May 2016 On time Download