Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALDERLEY EDGE
Charity number: 1131416
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV Robin Pye | Chair | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Martin Thomas Steiger | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||
AMANDA BRABBAN-BROWN | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Margaret Heather Jobling | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Rupert Barnaby Downes | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Hilary Shone | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles David Rogers | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Meredith Caporn | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Roberts | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rhona Dalziel | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Magee | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Margaret Seddon | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Pound | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA THOMPSON | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
WENDY JOYCE DAVIES | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JAMES ROBERT TUFFIN | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA PARR | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
IAN JEREMY STANDEN | Trustee | 13 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN ROBERT SINKER | Trustee | 15 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARGARET MILLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL SCAIFE | Trustee |
|
||||||
REVD CANON PROFESSOR LOVEDAY ALEXANDER MA DPHIL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.