THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALDERLEY EDGE

Charity number: 1131416
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
AMANDA PARR Trustee 28 April 2015 None on record
REVD CANON PROFESSOR LOVEDAY ALEXANDER MA DPHIL Trustee None on record
Rachel Roberts Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record
SUSAN MARGARET MILLS Trustee None on record
Sarah Magee Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record
Jennifer Pound Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
IAN JEREMY STANDEN Trustee 13 August 2013 None on record
Charles David Rogers Trustee 30 April 2021 None on record
Gillian Swain Trustee 16 October 2020 None on record
Rhona Dalziel Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record
SANDRA THOMPSON Trustee 23 April 2017 None on record
Simon John Meredith Caporn Trustee 30 April 2021 None on record
MARTIN ROBERT SINKER Trustee 15 August 2012 None on record
Gillian Hilary Shone Trustee 30 April 2021 None on record
Jane Margaret Seddon Trustee 14 April 2019 None on record
MICHAEL SCAIFE Trustee
WILMSLOW HISTORICAL SOCIETY Received: On time
THE ALDERLEY EDGE INSTITUTE TRUST Received: On time
WENDY JOYCE DAVIES Trustee 23 April 2017 None on record
REV Robin Pye Chair 15 May 2017 None on record
CELIA DAPHNE BERENT Trustee None on record
JAMES ROBERT TUFFIN Trustee 23 April 2017 None on record