THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALDERLEY EDGE

Charity number: 1131416
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £357.96k £365.14k £189.08k £176.99k £191.75k
Total expenditure £346.88k £409.79k £202.50k £199.45k £199.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £8.18k