Accounts and annual returns CASTLE SCHOOL (CAMBRIDGE) CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1139105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 September 2022 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 25 November 2022 | 178 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 03 October 2021 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 15 November 2021 | 168 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 26 March 2021 | 299 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 22 April 2021 | 326 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | 14 May 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window