Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GEORGE HANOVER SQUARE
Charity number: 1134811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER DARRYL SCOTT | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
SIMON JON ROBERTS | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
EMMA KATE GODFREY | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
OLIVER CHUBB | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
GRAHAM EDWARD BARNES | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
GAVIN CHARLES J ARENDT | Trustee | 29 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
DIANA MARY DENNIS | Trustee | 29 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev ALAN ROBERT LENNOX PIGGOT | Trustee | 29 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
THE REVD DR ALAN WILLIAM MCCORMACK | Trustee | 29 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
George Charles The Earl of Lucan | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
JANET ST JOHN-AUSTEN | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
CHARLES CHAMBERLAIN STEPHENS | Trustee | 25 October 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||
Stewart James Munro | Trustee | 28 April 2010 |
|
|
||||||||||
ANDREW ALEXANDER JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
Rev Roderick Neil Stephen Leece | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
MARK ANDREW HEWITT | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
ALISTAIR HENRY MILWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
PAMELA YAYRA ATEKPE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.