Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GEORGE HANOVER SQUARE

Charity number: 1134811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £971.57k £993.56k £770.53k £721.40k £628.16k
Total expenditure £850.69k £934.54k £733.35k £677.36k £710.94k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £565.30k £559.51k £324.31k £393.37k £281.71k
Income - Other trading activities £4.48k £1.89k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £204.61k £192.55k £198.71k £78.17k £143.11k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £174.18k £189.02k £227.18k £213.02k £161.45k
Income - Other £23.01k £50.60k £20.33k £36.85k £41.89k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £7.50k £10.00k £5.25k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £818.77k £877.06k £657.32k £608.66k £643.49k
Expenditure - Raising funds £31.92k £57.49k £76.03k £68.69k £67.45k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £15.43k £27.34k £30.90k £33.14k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £39.14k £0 £13.68k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £27.57k £18.04k £0 £23.20k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0